Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Novak

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1767BornSemilii
27 Jan 179325.3Ordained PriestPriest of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
4 Mar 182153.4SelectedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
27 Sep 182255.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
12 Jan 182355.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
20 Mar 184274.5ResignedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
22 Jun 184375.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
13 Jun 184476.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Novak
Archbishop Giuseppe Novak (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 219, and Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016