Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Miossich

Deceased

Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1786BornMakarska
7 Apr 181023.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Nov 182943.0SelectedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
15 Mar 183043.3ConfirmedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
18 Jul 183043.7Ordained BishopBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
10 Oct 183750.9DiedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Paolo Miossich:
Bishop Paolo Miossich (born , died ) Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013