Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alojzije Marija Pini

Deceased

Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1785BornŠibenik
19 Dec 180722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 180823.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 183953.4SelectedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
8 Jul 183953.8ConfirmedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
15 Dec 183954.2Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
31 Jan 184458.3SelectedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
17 Jun 184458.7ConfirmedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
11 Jan 186579.3DiedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Alojzije Marija Pini (VIAF: 305539048)
Bishop Alojzije Marija Pini (born , died ) Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 345, and Page 350
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016