Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioannes Berčić

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1785Born
3 May 180722.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
15 May 180823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
13 Jul 184055.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
13 Jul 184055.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Casius
22 Nov 184055.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casius
29 Nov 184560.5SelectedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
16 Apr 184660.9ConfirmedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
29 May 185570.0DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ioannes Berčić
Bishop Ioannes Berčić (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZadar

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 138, and Page 345
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,840, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast