Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stjepan Benedikt Pavlović-Lučić

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1825Born
29 Apr 184923.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 May 184923.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 188055.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
13 Dec 188055.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
16 Jan 188155.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
1904¹78.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stjepan Benedikt Pavlović-Lučić (VIAF: 305499461)
Bishop Stjepan Benedikt Pavlović-Lučić (born , died 1904) Auxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacarska, Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)
Ordained BishopMacarska, Diocese of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 413
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1881, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017