Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filip Franjo Nakić

Deceased

Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1837Born
14 Sep 186224.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 186224.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188952.2AppointedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
2 Feb 189052.3Ordained BishopBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
18 Dec 191073.2DiedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Filip Franjo Nakić (VIAF: 259494390)
Bishop Filip Franjo Nakić (born , died ) Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSelve, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zara, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 526
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017