Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josip Grgur Marčelić

Deceased

Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1847Born
25 Sep 187023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
16 Jan 189345.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
16 Jan 189345.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
12 Feb 189345.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
18 May 189447.1AppointedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
1 Sep 192881.4DiedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Josip Grgur Marčelić (VIAF: 305494648)
Bishop Josip Grgur Marčelić (born , died ) Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePreko, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zadar, Archdiocese of Zadar (Zara)

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 475, and Page 534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017