Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Pappafava

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1851BornHvar
27 Nov 191160.8AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
11 Feb 191261.0Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
14 Sep 191867.6AppointedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
19 Jul 192574.4DiedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Luca Pappafava:
Bishop Luca Pappafava (born , died ) Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013