Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vlaho Barbić

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

Titular Bishop of Sura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1878BornRagusa Vecchia [Cavtat]
20 Dec 192345.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
20 Dec 192345.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
30 Mar 192445.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
18 Nov 192850.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vlaho Barbić:
Bishop Vlaho Barbić (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015