Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miho Pušic

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

Titular Archbishop of Buxentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1880BornLissa
27 Nov 190323.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 192645.8AppointedBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
21 Sep 192646.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
19 Dec 194060.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
6 Jun 197089.8RetiredBishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
6 Jun 197089.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Buxentum
9 May 1972³91.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miho Pušic:
Archbishop Miho Pušic (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1971
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013