Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrija-Dusan Štambuk

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

Titular Bishop of Balanea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1913BornSelca
8 Aug 193724.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 195542.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia
14 May 195542.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Balanea
3 Jul 195542.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balanea
19 Aug 195542.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Andrija-Dusan Štambuk:
Bishop Andrija-Dusan Štambuk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hvar (-Brac e Vis)

  • a priest for 18.0 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1955, Number 54
  • b: CB, 5 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015