Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Frane Franić

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Split-Makarska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1912BornKambelovac
25 Dec 193624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
22 Sep 195037.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
22 Sep 195037.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
17 Dec 195038.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
24 Dec 196048.0AppointedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
27 Jul 196956.6AppointedArchbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia
10 Sep 198875.7RetiredArchbishop of Split-Makarska, Croatia
17 Mar 200794.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Split-Makarska, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Frane Franić:
Archbishop Frane Franić (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Split-Makarska

  • a priest for 70.2 years
  • a bishop for 56.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 100
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013