Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karmelo Zazinović

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Krk (Veglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1914BornKrk
29 Jun 193723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
18 Jan 196146.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
18 Jan 196146.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lebessus
23 Apr 196146.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lebessus
16 Jan 196853.5AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
14 Nov 198975.3RetiredBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
5 Mar 199782.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Karmelo Zazinović:
Bishop Karmelo Zazinović (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Krk (Veglia)

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013