Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton Bonaventura Jeglič

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

Titular Archbishop of Garella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1850Born
27 Jul 187323.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Aug 189747.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Siunia
12 Sep 189747.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siunia
24 Mar 189847.8AppointedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
17 May 193079.9RetiredBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
17 May 193079.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Garella
1 Jul 193787.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Anton Bonaventura Jeglič (VIAF: 38629064)
Archbishop Anton Bonaventura Jeglič (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBegunje, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)
Ordained BishopSarajevo, Archdiocese of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 330, and Page 522
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017