Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregor Ro×man

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1883Born
21 Jul 190724.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 192946.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
17 Mar 192946.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Semta
14 Jul 192946.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Semta
17 May 193047.1SucceededBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
16 Nov 195976.6DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Gregor Ro×man
Bishop Gregor Ro×man (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSmikel pri Pliberku

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1929, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018