Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Jordán

Deceased

Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1845Born
6 Jun 186822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
9 Jun 190256.5AppointedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
20 Jul 190256.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
4 Oct 190559.8DiedArchbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Jordán
Archbishop Andrea Jordán (born , died ) Archbishop of Gorizia e Gradisca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1902, Number 45
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,884

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast