Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janez Franciszek Gnidovec, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Skopje, Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1873Born
23 Jul 189622.8Ordained PriestPriest
1919²45.2ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Mission
29 Oct 192451.0AppointedBishop of Skopje, Macedonia
30 Nov 192451.1Ordained BishopBishop of Skopje, Macedonia
3 Feb 193965.3DiedBishop of Skopje, Macedonia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Janez Franciszek Gnidovec
Bishop Janez Franciszek Gnidovec C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeliki Lipovec

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast