Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Trifone Pederzolli

Deceased

Bishop of Poreč i Pula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1864BornKotor
28 Nov 188622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
19 Jun 191349.4AppointedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
5 Oct 191349.7Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
22 Apr 194177.2DiedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Trifone Pederzolli:
Bishop Trifone Pederzolli (born , died ) Bishop of Poreč i Pula

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013