Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Santin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1895BornRovigno
1 May 191822.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Aug 193337.6AppointedBishop of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
29 Oct 193337.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rijeka (-Opatija), Croatia
16 May 193842.4AppointedBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
13 Jul 196367.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
28 Jun 197579.5RetiredBishop of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy
17 Mar 198185.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper), Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Santin:
Archbishop Antonio Santin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trieste e Capodistria (Koper)

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015