Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Mario Radossi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Spoleto, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Equilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1887Born
21 Nov 190922.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
27 Nov 194154.4AppointedBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
25 Jan 194254.6Ordained BishopBishop of Poreč i Pula, Croatia
7 Jul 194861.0AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
23 Jun 196780.0RetiredArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
23 Jun 196780.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Equilium
27 Sep 197285.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Spoleto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Mario Radossi
Archbishop Raffaele Mario Radossi O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Spoleto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCherso

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018