Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Maria Costantini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sessa Aurunca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1906BornGubbio
7 Jul 192923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
28 May 196256.3AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
8 Jul 196256.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
25 Oct 198276.7RetiredBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
3 Sep 200397.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Maria Costantini:
Bishop Vittorio Maria Costantini O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sessa Aurunca

  • a priest for 74.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 98
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015