Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francescantonio Nolč, O.F.M. Conv.

Archbishop of Cosenza-Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1948 BornPotenza
1 Nov 197123.3Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
2 Sep 197325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Nov 200052.4AppointedBishop of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
10 Dec 200052.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
7 Jan 200152.5InstalledBishop of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
15 May 201566.9AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy
4 Jul 201567.0InstalledArchbishop of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francescantonio Nolč:
Archbishop Francescantonio Nolč O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Archbishop of Cosenza-Bisignano

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,868
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2015
  • i: CB, 5 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015