Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ennio Appignanesi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1925BornBelforte del Chienti
8 Apr 195024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
20 Dec 198055.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lucera, Italy
20 Dec 198055.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Themisonium
6 Jan 198155.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themisonium
15 Sep 198358.2AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
3 Jul 198560.0AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Jul 198560.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lorium
21 Jan 198862.5AppointedArchbishop of Matera-Irsina, Italy
19 Jan 199367.5AppointedArchbishop of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy
9 Jan 200175.5RetiredArchbishop of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy
26 Mar 201589.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ennio Appignanesi:
Archbishop Ennio Appignanesi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Potenza-Muro Lucano-Marsico Nuovo

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 26 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 27 Mar 2015