Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Matera-Irsina

Archidioecesis Materanensis-Montis Pelusii



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Matera
9th CenturyErectedDiocese of Matera (erected)
Archdiocese of Matera
11th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Matera Archdiocese of Matera
7 May 1203UnitedArchdiocese of Acerenza
Archdiocese of Matera
Archdiocese of Acerenza e Matera
Archdiocese of Matera
2 July 1954SplitArchdiocese of Acerenza e Matera Archdiocese of Acerenza
Archdiocese of Matera
Diocese of Matera
21 August 1976ElevatedArchdiocese of Matera Diocese of Matera (Archdiocese to Diocese)
8 September 1976Territory LostDiocese of Matera (Ginosa and Laterza) Diocese of Castellaneta
8 September 1976Territory AddedDiocese of Anglona-Tursi (Craco, Montalbano Ionico, and Scansano Ionico) Diocese of Matera
8 September 1976Territory AddedDiocese of Tricarico (Salandra) Diocese of Matera
Diocese of Matera e Irsina
11 October 1976UnitedDiocese of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)
Diocese of Matera
Diocese of Matera e Irsina
Archdiocese of Matera e Irsina
3 December 1977ElevatedDiocese of Matera e Irsina Archdiocese of Matera e Irsina
Archdiocese of Matera-Irsina
30 September 1986Name ChangedArchdiocese of Matera e Irsina Archdiocese of Matera-Irsina

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Matera
1970136,764.0%94311250346239ap1971
Diocese of Matera
Diocese of Matera e Irsina
Archdiocese of Matera e Irsina
1980138,900139,90099.3%5432861,61523414350ap1981
Archdiocese of Matera-Irsina
1990139,000141,80098.0%5630861,6163211350ap1991
1999140,600141,65399.3%6419831,693228151ap2000
2000140,600141,65399.3%7319921,528218151ap2001
2001140,600141,65399.3%8015951,480178151ap2002
2002140,000140,89999.4%6915841,6661186352ap2003
2003140,000140,89999.4%7220921,5211236152ap2004
2004140,000140,89999.4%7420941,4891236152ap2005
2013140,000144,64496.8%6929981,428326455ap2014
2016139,000142,79497.3%6925941,4784306255ap2017
2019129,800149,80086.6%6823911,4264296056ap2020
2021128,250148,00086.7%7023931,3794263055ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Matera
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 522, to Page 524
  • Diocese of Matera
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 593, and Page 594
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 675, to Page 677
  • Diocese of Matera e Irsina
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 641, and Page 642
  • Archdiocese of Matera-Irsina
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 732, to Page 735
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 11 Feb 2024