Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Ciliberti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Catanzaro-Squillace, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1935Born
12 Jul 195924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
7 Dec 198853.8AppointedBishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
28 Jan 198953.9Ordained BishopBishop of Locri-Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
6 May 199358.2AppointedArchbishop of Matera-Irsina, Italy
31 Jan 200368.0AppointedArchbishop of Catanzaro-Squillace, Italy
5 Apr 200368.1InstalledArchbishop of Catanzaro-Squillace, Italy
25 Mar 201176.1RetiredArchbishop of Catanzaro-Squillace, Italy
1 Apr 201782.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Catanzaro-Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ciliberti (VIAF: 89026625)
Archbishop Antonio Ciliberti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Catanzaro-Squillace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lorenzo del Vallo
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,242
  • d: CB, 1 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Apr 2017