Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Serafino Sprovieri

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1930Born
12 Jul 195323.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 197847.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy
11 Feb 197847.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Themisonium
9 Apr 197847.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themisonium
31 Jul 198050.2AppointedArchbishop of Rossano e Cariati, Italy
25 Nov 199161.5AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
3 May 200675.9RetiredArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
3 Jan 201887.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Serafino Sprovieri (VIAF: 89690833)
Archbishop Serafino Sprovieri (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pietro in Guarano
Death PlaceCosenza, Archdiocese of Cosenza-Bisignano

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 May 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 3 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 3 Jan 2018