Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Pio Tamburrino, O.S.B.

Archbishop of Foggia-Bovino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1939 BornOppido Lucano
11 Oct 195516.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Aug 196526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Nov 198950.9SelectedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
20 Jan 199051.0ConfirmedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
14 Feb 199859.1AppointedBishop of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy
25 Mar 199859.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy
27 Apr 199960.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
2 Aug 200364.6AppointedArchbishop of Foggia-Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pio Tamburrino:
Archbishop Francesco Pio Tamburrino O.S.B. (born ) Archbishop of Foggia-Bovino

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Foggia-Bovino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,258
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013