Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Spinillo

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1951 Born
15 Jul 197827.2Ordained PriestPriest of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
18 Mar 200048.8AppointedBishop of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy
13 May 200049.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy
15 Jan 201159.7AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
19 Feb 201159.7InstalledBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Spinillo
Bishop Angelo Spinillo (born ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Arsenio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aversa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,764
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast