Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio De Luca, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Teggiano-Policastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1956 BornTorre del Greco
29 Sep 197317.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
5 Jul 198125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
26 Nov 201155.4AppointedBishop of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy
7 Jan 201255.5Ordained BishopBishop of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy
4 Feb 201255.6InstalledBishop of Teggiano-Policastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio De Luca:
Bishop Antonio De Luca C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Teggiano-Policastro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Teggiano-Policastro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Dec 2011
  • i: CB, 4 Dec 2011
  • c34: CB, 15 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013