Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Bartolomeo Bortignon, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Padova {Padua}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1905BornFellette di Romano d'Ezzelino
3 Mar 192822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Apr 194439.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
4 Apr 194439.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
14 May 194439.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
9 Sep 194540.4AppointedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
1 Apr 194944.0AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
7 Jan 198276.8RetiredBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
12 Mar 199286.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Bartolomeo Bortignon:
Bishop Girolamo Bartolomeo Bortignon O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 47.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013