Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Carniello

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Volterra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1917BornVillafranca Padovana
6 Jul 194123.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 196749.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
2 Apr 196749.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Martanae Tudertinorum
14 May 196749.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martanae Tudertinorum
197052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Volterra, Italy
7 Oct 197557.8AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
5 Mar 198567.3ResignedBishop of Volterra, Italy
26 Feb 200183.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Carniello:
Bishop Roberto Carniello (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Volterra

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013