Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio De Zanche

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1888Born
26 Jul 191325.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 194052.1AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
24 Oct 194052.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
23 Sep 194961.2AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
14 Apr 197788.8DiedBishop of Concordia-Pordenone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio De Zanche (VIAF: 88822816)
Bishop Vittorio De Zanche (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia-Pordenone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSelvazzano

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1940, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018