Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Tarantino, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arua, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1908Born
19 Mar 193223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
12 Feb 195950.8AppointedBishop of Arua, Uganda
1 May 195951.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arua, Uganda
29 Dec 198476.7RetiredBishop of Arua, Uganda
15 Apr 199082.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Arua, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Angelo Tarantino
Bishop Angelo Tarantino F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arua

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto Gruaro, Italy

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1959, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018