Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cipriano Biyehima Kihangire

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gulu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1918BornHoima
17 Feb 195132.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 196244.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gulu, Uganda
12 Nov 196244.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Maura
24 Mar 196345.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maura
20 Jan 196445.8AppointedBishop of Uganda, Military
9 Aug 196547.4AppointedBishop of Hoima, Uganda
19 Dec 196850.8AppointedBishop of Gulu, Uganda
5 Jan 198566.8ResignedBishop of Uganda, Military
9 Jan 198869.8ResignedBishop of Gulu, Uganda
1 Nov 199072.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Gulu, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Cipriano Biyehima Kihangire:
Bishop Cipriano Biyehima Kihangire (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gulu

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013