Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Cesana, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gulu

Titular Bishop of Litterae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1899BornCastello sopra Lecco, Italy
6 Jun 192526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
1 Dec 195051.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gulu, Uganda
1 Dec 195051.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cerbali
1 Apr 195151.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cerbali
25 Mar 195353.8AppointedBishop of Gulu, Uganda
19 Dec 196869.5ResignedBishop of Gulu, Uganda
19 Dec 196869.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Litterae
12 Jun 199192.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Gulu, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Cesana:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Cesana M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gulu

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015