Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felice Bonomini

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1895Born
17 Dec 192126.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 194045.4AppointedBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
27 Oct 194045.6Ordained BishopBishop of Terni e Narni, Italy
21 Nov 194752.6AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
1 Nov 197479.6DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Bonomini
Bishop Felice Bonomini (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMocasina

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,940, Number 72
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 654, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast