Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio De Battista, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vijayawada, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1905Born
2 Jun 192823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
13 Dec 195146.5AppointedBishop of Vijayawada, India
19 Mar 195246.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vijayawada, India
23 Jan 197165.6ResignedBishop of Vijayawada, India
15 Dec 197166.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Vijayawada, India

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio De Battista
Bishop Ambrogio De Battista P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vijayawada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMandello del Lario, Diocese of Como, Italy
Ordained BishopChurch, Mandello del Lario, Diocese of Como, Italy

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,952, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 654

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast