Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Vijayawada

Dioecesis Viiayavadanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 21 October 1950
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Visakhapatnam
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 8,734 (3,373 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 59 A-1-7 Ring Road, Patamata, Vijayawada-520008, Krishna Dt., A.P., India
  • Telephone: (0866)2471.355
  • Fax: 2478.629

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bezwada
10 January 1933ErectedDiocese of Hyderabad Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bezwada (erected)
Diocese of Bezwada
13 April 1937ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Bezwada Diocese of Bezwada
Diocese of Vijayawada
21 October 1950Name ChangedDiocese of Bezwada Diocese of Vijayawada
9 December 1976Territory LostDiocese of Vijayawada Diocese of Eluru (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Vijayawada
195060,2633,471,8491.7%635411,4696517ap1951
1970147,0015,500,0002.7%5236881,6706042345ap1971
1980129,5592,545,0005.1%4431751,7277638943ap1981
1990171,0243,872,6554.4%60491091,5699652256ap1991
1999214,3434,206,3625.1%72661381,55312069274ap2000
2000224,5144,299,8755.2%73701431,57012068977ap2002
2002269,9834,388,6086.2%74731471,83612570077ap2003
2003233,8024,938,4094.7%76791551,50812971577ap2004
2004253,7045,142,6144.9%82791611,57512871577ap2005
2010277,6735,038,0005.5%120912111,31534671689ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 2 Sep 2012