Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Visakhapatnam

Archidioecesis Visakhapatnamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Prakash Mallavarapu, Archbishop
  • Mariadas Kagithapu, M.S.F.S., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 2001
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 25,950 (10,023 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://visakhapatnamarchdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Maharanipeta, Visahapatnam-530002, A.P., India
  • Telephone: (0891)2706.428
  • Fax: 2705.781

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Vizagapatam
1850ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Vizagapatam (erected)
Diocese of Vizagapatam
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Vizagapatam Diocese of Vizagapatam
11 July 1887Territory LostDiocese of Vizagapatam Diocese of Nagpur (erected)
18 July 1928Territory LostDiocese of Vizagapatam Mission "Sui Iuris" of Cuttack (erected)
Diocese of Visakhapatnam
21 October 1950Name ChangedDiocese of Vizagapatam Diocese of Visakhapatnam
1 July 1993Territory LostDiocese of Visakhapatnam Diocese of Srikakulam (erected)
Archdiocese of Visakhapatnam
16 October 2001ElevatedDiocese of Visakhapatnam Archdiocese of Visakhapatnam

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Visakhapatnam
195031,1257,000,000.4%93443723610626ap1951
197069,8237,240,0001.0%2843719838112133ap1971
198090,4698,460,0001.1%4342851,0647529135ap1981
1990116,49611,530,8471.0%48571051,1098744956ap1991
1999147,93412,014,2741.2%48641121,32010045347ap2000
2000161,58412,070,7631.3%51631141,4177247747ap2002
Archdiocese of Visakhapatnam
2002214,20012,339,0581.7%51721231,7417850750ap2003
2003217,23512,390,7031.8%55721271,7107643150ap2004
2004218,80612,403,1051.8%53711241,7649442856ap2005
2010247,23112,640,6842.0%64891531,61511547062ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013