Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Gopu, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Visakhapatnam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1912BornRentachintala
28 Sep 194533.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
10 Dec 196351.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Visakhapatnam, India
10 Dec 196351.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
7 Apr 196451.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
4 Oct 196654.3SucceededBishop of Visakhapatnam, India
2 Aug 198169.1DiedBishop of Visakhapatnam, India

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Gopu:
Bishop Ignatius Gopu M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Visakhapatnam

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 9 Dec 2013