Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Mark Gopu

Deceased

Archbishop of Hyderabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1907Born
20 Dec 193326.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 194840.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pondicherry, India
8 Jul 194840.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gilba
29 Sep 194840.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gilba
8 Jan 195345.2AppointedBishop of Hyderabad, India
19 Sep 195345.9AppointedArchbishop of Hyderabad, India
28 Feb 197163.3DiedArchbishop of Hyderabad, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mark Gopu
Archbishop Joseph Mark Gopu (born , died ) Archbishop of Hyderabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTatchur

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast