Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Auguste-Siméon Colas, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India

Titular Archbishop of Arcadiopolis in Europa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1876Born
24 Jun 190023.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Jun 193053.4AppointedArchbishop of Pondicherry, India
29 Sep 193053.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Pondicherry, India
28 Oct 195578.8RetiredArchbishop of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India
28 Oct 195578.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Arcadiopolis in Europa
24 Oct 196891.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore, India

MicroData Summary for Auguste-Siméon Colas
Archbishop Auguste-Siméon Colas M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pondicherry and Cuddalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, France

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,930, Number 62
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 536, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 723, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 25 Feb 2020

Quantcast