Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Muthappa

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbatore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1897BornSomanur
16 Dec 192326.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Dec 194952.0AppointedBishop of Coimbatore, India
26 Apr 195052.3Ordained BishopBishop of Coimbatore, India
23 Nov 197173.9DiedBishop of Coimbatore, India

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Muthappa:
Bishop Francis Xavier Muthappa (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbatore

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015