Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Jean-Marie Laouënan, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Pondicherry, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1822Born
6 Jun 184623.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Jul 186845.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pondicherry, India
24 Jul 186845.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
11 Oct 186845.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
25 Nov 188664.0AppointedArchbishop of Pondicherry, India
29 Sep 189269.8DiedArchbishop of Pondicherry, India

MicroData Summary for François-Jean-Marie Laouënan (VIAF: 7382120)
Archbishop François-Jean-Marie Laouënan M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Pondicherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLannion, France
Ordained BishopPondicherry, Vicariate Apostolic of Pondicherry

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 272, and Page 462
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 41
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 536, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 723, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,120, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast