Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard Gasnier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malacca, Singapore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1833Born
6 Jun 185724.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
5 Apr 187844.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore
5 Apr 187844.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
2 Jun 187845.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
10 Aug 188855.2AppointedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
8 Apr 189662.9DiedBishop of Malacca, Singapore

MicroData Summary for Edouard Gasnier
Bishop Edouard Gasnier M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Malacca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers, Diocese of Angers, France
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Bangalore, Diocese of Bangalore, India

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 263, and Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,878, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast