Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Désiré-François-Xavier Van Camelbeke, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1839Born
30 May 186324.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Jan 188444.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}, Viet Nam
15 Jan 188444.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
27 Apr 188445.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
9 Nov 190162.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Désiré-François-Xavier Van Camelbeke
Bishop Désiré-François-Xavier Van Camelbeke M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes, France

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017