Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucien-Emile Mossard, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Medea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1851BornDampierre-sur-le-Doubs, France
23 Sep 187624.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 Feb 189947.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam
11 Feb 189947.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Medea
1 May 189947.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medea
12 Feb 192068.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Lucien-Emile Mossard:
Bishop Lucien-Emile Mossard M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013