Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor-Charles Quinton, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Laranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1866BornCarelles, France
21 Sep 188922.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
12 Dec 191246.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam
12 Dec 191246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Laranda
15 Apr 191346.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laranda
11 Feb 192053.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam
4 Oct 192457.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Victor-Charles Quinton:
Bishop Victor-Charles Quinton M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Cochin {Cocincina Occidentale}

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013