Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Ambroise Bigandet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1813BornMalans, France
18 Feb 183723.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Mar 184632.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore
27 Mar 184632.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
30 Mar 185642.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ramata (Rama)
186652.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Siam {Siam Occidentale}, Thailand
12 Aug 187056.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}, Myanmar
19 Mar 189480.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Paul Ambroise Bigandet: VIAF:42136802
Bishop Paul Ambroise Bigandet M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 475
  • ab/ob: CB, 8 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015