Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Arsène Bourdon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Dardanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1834BornCaligny, France
2 Jun 186026.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1 Oct 187238.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar
1 Oct 187238.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
5 Jan 187338.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
1 May 188753.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar
9 Oct 191884.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Charles Arsène Bourdon:
Bishop Charles Arsène Bourdon M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013